U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00405
  • Case Name: Sumitomo Mitsui Finance and Leasing Co Ltd v. Scorpion Pump and Industrial LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Order]
  • December 02, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 20, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 17, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 02, 2022: [Objections]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • October 25, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 24, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • October 21, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • October 21, 2022: [Witness List]
  • October 21, 2022: [Objections]
  • October 07, 2022: [Witness List]
  • October 07, 2022: [Exhibit List]
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • August 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • July 27, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • July 25, 2022: [Vacate]
  • July 25, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Docket]
  • June 27, 2022: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
  • June 24, 2022: [Entry of Default]
  • June 15, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 13, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • June 13, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • May 19, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 19, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • May 18, 2022: [Complaint]
  • May 18, 2022: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.