U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00411
  • Case Name: Fletcher v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 29, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 04, 2022: [Reminder - General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • October 03, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • October 03, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • August 19, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order]
  • August 19, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • August 18, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • May 25, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 23, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 19, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
  • May 19, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.