U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00414
  • Case Name: Twin Rock Partners LLC v. Underwriters at Lloyds London et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Enforce]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • October 21, 2022: [Withdraw]
  • October 14, 2022: [Enforce]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • September 06, 2022: [ADR Report by Mediator / Evaluator]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • August 02, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 12, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • July 12, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • July 07, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • June 27, 2022: [Leave]
  • June 27, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • June 24, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 23, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order]
  • June 07, 2022: [Docket]
  • June 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • May 23, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 23, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • May 20, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.