U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00416
  • Case Name: Vanbrunt v. Oncue Marketing LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order]
  • June 29, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 28, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • June 28, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • June 02, 2022: [Docket]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
  • May 23, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • May 23, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 23, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.