U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00419
  • Case Name: Rupert v. The Bureaus Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Entry of Default]
  • June 27, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 02, 2022: [Summons Issued]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 27, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 24, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • May 24, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.