U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00432
  • Case Name: James v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Social Security Response Brief]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 09, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 09, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • August 30, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • August 30, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order]
  • August 26, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 23, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
  • August 23, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 23, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • June 06, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 02, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • May 31, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 26, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.