U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00497
  • Case Name: Plotner v. Ovintiv USA Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 23, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 21, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 21, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 31, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • October 31, 2022: [Partial Summary Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • September 16, 2022: [Protective Order]
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • July 27, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Docket]
  • June 23, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • June 23, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • June 17, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • June 17, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 16, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.