U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00496
  • Case Name: Skurkey v. Daniel et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Reply]
  • October 17, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 09, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • September 09, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 02, 2022: [Certificate of Service - NON SUMMONS]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 17, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 17, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • June 16, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.