U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00506
  • Case Name: Salazar v. Root Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • September 02, 2022: [Docket]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
  • August 17, 2022: [Dismiss]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 28, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • July 28, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • July 26, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • July 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • June 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 21, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.