U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00501
  • Case Name: Lopez-Almarez et al v. Lopez et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Order Setting Settlement Conference]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • May 01, 2025: [Reply]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Leave]
  • April 04, 2025: [Reply]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 27, 2025: [Reply]
  • March 20, 2025: [Response to Motion]
February, 2025
  • February 07, 2025: [Notice of Subpoena]
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice of Subpoena]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 24, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • October 24, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • October 12, 2022: [Docket]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • October 04, 2022: [Quash]
  • October 04, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 03, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order]
  • October 03, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • September 15, 2022: [Docket]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 14, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • July 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order for Response]
  • June 21, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • June 21, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.