U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00514
  • Case Name: Franklin v. Wovenlife Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 20, 2023: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Docket]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • September 28, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • September 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 21, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 12, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 12, 2022: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 22, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • June 21, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.