U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00523
  • Case Name: Eshelman v. Merck & Co Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 22, 2022: [Conditional Transfer Order]
  • August 15, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 22, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • July 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order for Response]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • June 23, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 23, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.