U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00532
  • Case Name: Sanders v. Central Oklahoma Transportation and Parking Authority
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 19, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • October 12, 2022: [Docket]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order of Recusal]
  • October 11, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • October 11, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 12, 2022: [Summons Issued]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • June 24, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.