U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00541
  • Case Name: Turner v. Walmart Stores East LP
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • July 21, 2022: [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Docket]
  • June 28, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • June 28, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • June 28, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • June 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 28, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • June 28, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.