U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cv-01096
  • Case Name: Johnson et al v. David Stanley Chevrolet Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
  • July 18, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order]
  • July 12, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.