U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00553
  • Case Name: Smith-Francisco v. Southwest Airlines Co
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 24, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • October 11, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 03, 2022: [Docket]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • September 09, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • September 09, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 06, 2022: [Receipt]
  • July 05, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.