U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00579
  • Case Name: Orange v. Millennium Financial Group LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order]
  • October 04, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order for Response]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Leave]
  • September 26, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
  • September 15, 2022: [Docket]
  • September 06, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • September 06, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • September 06, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 05, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • September 02, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • September 02, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order for Response]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • July 13, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • July 12, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.