U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00581
  • Case Name: Flores v. Werner
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
  • January 05, 2023: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • August 12, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • August 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 10, 2022: [Docket]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • July 13, 2022: [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
  • July 13, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 13, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.