U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cv-00333
  • Case Name: Donahue v. Bergerhouse et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 16, 2023: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 21, 2022: [Extension of Time]
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [ADR Report by Mediator / Evaluator]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • July 28, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order Setting Settlement Conference]
  • July 20, 2022: [Continue]
  • July 18, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 12, 2022: [Extension of Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.