U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00604
  • Case Name: Williams v. Tiger Commissary et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Mail Returned]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 28, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • October 25, 2022: [Mail Returned]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 21, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • July 21, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 21, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.