U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00606
  • Case Name: Haworth v. Tronox Holdings PLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • December 06, 2022: [Docket]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • October 25, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • October 25, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • October 11, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • October 11, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • July 21, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.