U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00612
  • Case Name: Nevel v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 02, 2022: [Extension of Time]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 22, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • October 22, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 21, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order]
  • October 12, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
  • September 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 21, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
  • July 21, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.