U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00610
  • Case Name: Muniz v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 02, 2022: [Extension of Time]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 11, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 03, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • October 18, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order]
  • October 18, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 28, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 01, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order]
  • July 21, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.