U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00617
  • Case Name: Henderson v. Express Credit Auto LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 16, 2023: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • January 16, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order]
  • January 10, 2023: [Docket]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • December 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • December 20, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • December 06, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 16, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 16, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 01, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • November 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 28, 2022: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
  • October 05, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 04, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 28, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 26, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • July 25, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 25, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.