U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00620
  • Case Name: Pribble v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 04, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • September 21, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • September 21, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order]
  • September 20, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • September 19, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
  • September 19, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 11, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 25, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order]
  • July 25, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 25, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 25, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 25, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.