U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00611
  • Case Name: Hendricks v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 09, 2022: [Extension of Time]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 11, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • October 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 26, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • October 25, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order]
  • October 06, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • October 05, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
  • October 05, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
  • July 25, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.