U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00630
  • Case Name: Graham v. National Union Fire Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 04, 2023: [Protective Order]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • December 09, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • December 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Answer to Intervenor Complaint]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Intervenor Complaint]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • September 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 02, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • September 02, 2022: [Intervene]
  • September 02, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 01, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Docket]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.