U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00632
  • Case Name: Hessler v. Western Express Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • January 18, 2023: [Response to Motion]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 11, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 03, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 27, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • December 23, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • December 01, 2022: [Docket]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • November 29, 2022: [Show Cause]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • August 24, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • July 29, 2022: [Complaint]
  • July 29, 2022: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.