U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00635
  • Case Name: Norred v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Dismiss]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • December 12, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order]
  • December 12, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • December 07, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
  • December 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 14, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • November 14, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to Non-party]
  • November 14, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • August 01, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.