U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00639
  • Case Name: Gardner v. Ace Moving and Storage Llc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Reply]
  • January 04, 2023: [Response to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Joinder]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Reply]
  • October 18, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 18, 2022: [Response to Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 14, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 19, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 05, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • August 05, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 04, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • August 04, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 03, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 01, 2022: [Receipt]
  • August 01, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • August 01, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.