U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00644
  • Case Name: Firanski v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • December 28, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order]
  • December 21, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • December 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 08, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to Non-party]
  • November 14, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 02, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 02, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.