U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00649
  • Case Name: Hargus v. Georgia-Pacific Gypsum LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Order]
  • January 06, 2023: [Notice of Subpoena]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • October 05, 2022: [Docket]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • September 14, 2022: [Leave]
  • September 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 06, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • September 06, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 29, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • August 26, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 04, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 03, 2022: [Complaint]
  • August 03, 2022: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.