U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cv-00204
  • Case Name: Bosse v. Farris
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Letter]
  • May 08, 2025: [Letter]
  • May 08, 2025: [Certification of Issue to State Court]
  • May 07, 2025: [~Notice (other)]
  • May 07, 2025: [Reply]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Reply]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 02, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 22, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 22, 2025: [Leave to File Reply]
  • April 22, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Reply]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 23, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 10, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 11, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 08, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [State Court Records Received - Conventional Filing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.