U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00668
  • Case Name: Bowser v. Walmart Stores East LP et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • September 02, 2022: [Docket]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
  • August 08, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • August 08, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 08, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • August 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 08, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 08, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.