U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00684
  • Case Name: Wright v. Blakes et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Administrative Closing Order]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Joint Status Report]
  • October 11, 2024: [Leave]
  • October 08, 2024: [Designation of Deposition Testimony]
  • October 08, 2024: [Counter Designation of Deposition Testimony]
  • October 07, 2024: [Docket]
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • January 04, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 03, 2023: [Docket]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • December 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 08, 2022: [Vacate]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Return of Service - NON SUMMONS]
  • October 13, 2022: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
  • October 11, 2022: [Entry of Default]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 11, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 11, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.