U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00681
  • Case Name: Watkins v. United States Department of Justice et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 19, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Receipt]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 12, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • August 12, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 12, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Mandamus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.