U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00692
  • Case Name: Frogge v. City of Bethany et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 05, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 18, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • October 17, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • October 12, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • October 11, 2022: [Leave]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • October 07, 2022: [File Excess Pages]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 15, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 13, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 12, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • September 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 07, 2022: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
  • September 07, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 19, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order for Response]
  • August 12, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 12, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.