U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00691
  • Case Name: Bryant v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [General Order 23-1 and Consent Form]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order]
  • January 19, 2023: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • January 19, 2023: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
  • January 19, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • November 22, 2022: [Leave]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 12, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 12, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
  • August 12, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.