U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00706
  • Case Name: Sullivan v. United Security Health and Casualty Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Terminate Hearings]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order]
  • November 07, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Docket]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 18, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 18, 2022: [Status Report]
  • August 17, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 17, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 17, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 17, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.