U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00712
  • Case Name: Nguyen v. Roadlink Express Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Certificate]
  • November 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 14, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order]
  • October 28, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • October 25, 2022: [Docket]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • August 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 19, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 18, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • August 18, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.