U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00714
  • Case Name: Price et al v. CSAA General Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 10, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • October 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • October 03, 2022: [Leave]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • September 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 02, 2022: [Docket]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • August 19, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 19, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 19, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 19, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.