U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00720
  • Case Name: Kamilov v. LT Hart, Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 18, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • November 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 24, 2022: [Docket]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • August 26, 2022: [Certificate]
  • August 22, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 22, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 19, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.