U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00530
  • Case Name: Collins v. Singh et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • September 02, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • August 22, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order]
  • August 19, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.