U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00724
  • Case Name: Wood v. Wal-Mart Stores East LP
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 16, 2023: [Witness List]
  • January 09, 2023: [Witness List]
  • January 03, 2023: [Witness List - Expert]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order]
  • October 04, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 26, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • September 15, 2022: [Docket]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order of Recusal]
  • August 23, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • August 23, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 23, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • August 23, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 23, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 22, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.