U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00781
  • Case Name: Stainkamp v. Patriot Auto Group 2 LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice of Address Change]
  • January 20, 2023: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Docket]
  • December 22, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • December 05, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • December 05, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • December 05, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 13, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • October 04, 2022: [Waiver of Service Unexecuted]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 06, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 02, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.