U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00813
  • Case Name: Windy City Flyers Inc v. Federal Aviation Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • November 09, 2022: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • November 09, 2022: [Default Judgment]
  • November 09, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • November 09, 2022: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
  • November 08, 2022: [Entry of Default]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • November 03, 2022: [Default Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • October 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 11, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • October 05, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 15, 2022: [Receipt]
  • September 15, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.