U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00825
  • Case Name: Rosemary Pelfrey Revocable Trust v. Western World Insurance Group Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Protective Order]
  • January 18, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 16, 2023: [Protective Order]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order]
  • October 18, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • October 05, 2022: [Docket]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • September 23, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 20, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.