U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00835
  • Case Name: Hiscox Insurance Company Inc v. Purpose Janitorial LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • January 04, 2023: [Affidavit of Service - NON SUMMONS]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Summons Issued]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 20, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.