U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00838
  • Case Name: Clemence v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Social Security Opening Brief]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • December 20, 2022: [Reminder - General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • November 16, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • November 04, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
  • November 04, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 07, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 21, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order]
  • September 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 21, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 21, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.