U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00856
  • Case Name: Tri-State Electrical Contractors LLC v. Consolidated Electrical Distributos Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 10, 2023: [Summons Issued]
  • January 10, 2023: [Entry of Default]
  • January 05, 2023: [Status Conference]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Hearing]
  • December 22, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • December 21, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 06, 2022: [Docket]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
  • November 11, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • November 09, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • November 04, 2022: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • November 02, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • October 27, 2022: [Crossclaim]
  • October 27, 2022: [Entry of Default]
  • October 27, 2022: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • October 27, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • October 20, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 18, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • October 18, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • October 18, 2022: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • October 17, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 12, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • October 12, 2022: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • October 11, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 06, 2022: [Crossclaim]
  • October 06, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • October 06, 2022: [Counterclaim]
  • October 06, 2022: [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
  • October 06, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 05, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • September 29, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 29, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.